Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Crameri, S.S.C.

Vicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1969 Born
8 Jun 199627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Priestly Society of St. Joseph Benedict Cottolengo
20 Dec 201950.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
20 Dec 201950.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Apollonia
29 Feb 202051.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Apollonia
5 Jul 202152.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador
2 Sep 202152.6InstalledVicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Antonio Crameri
Bishop Antonio Crameri S.S.C. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Esmeraldas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLocarno, Cantón Ticino, Switzerland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Guayaquil, Archdiocese of Guayaquil

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Esmeraldas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Dec 2019
  • ob: CB, 20 Dec 2019
  • bp: CB, 6 Feb 2020
  • c2+: CB, 28 Feb 2020
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 243, Number 20,360
  • ab: Bollettino, 5 Jun 2021
  • i: AM, 16 Jul 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Jul 2021

Quantcast