Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Remijio Adam Gbitiku, M.C.C.I.

Bishop of Wau, South Sudan

Apostolic Administrator of Rumbek


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 May 1972 Born
18 Nov 200331.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
3 Oct 200432.4Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
18 Nov 202048.5AppointedBishop of Wau, South Sudan
24 Jan 202148.7Ordained BishopBishop of Wau, South Sudan
5 May 202149.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rumbek, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Matthew Remijio Adam Gbitiku
Bishop Matthew Remijio Adam Gbitiku M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop of Wau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMboro, Vicariate Apostolic of Wau, Sudan
Ordained PriestSquare, In Front of, St. Mary Help of Christians, Cathedral, Wau, Diocese of Wau
Ordained BishopGrounds of, St. Mary Help of Christians, Cathedral, Wau, Diocese of Wau

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Nov 2020
  • od: CB, 18 Nov 2020
  • ob: CB, 19 Dec 2020
  • c23: CB, 24 Jan 2021
  • c4: CB, 25 Jan 2021
  • aadm: CB, 5 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 6 May 2021

Quantcast