Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Christian Carlassare, M.C.C.I.

Bishop-Elect of Rumbek, South Sudan

Titular See: (consecration postponed)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1977 Born
19 Dec 200326.2Solemn VowsMember of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
4 Sep 200426.9Ordained PriestPriest of Comboni Missionaries of the Heart of Jesus
8 Mar 202143.4AppointedBishop of Rumbek, South Sudan

MicroData Summary for Christian Carlassare
Father Christian Carlassare M.C.C.I. (born ) Bishop-Elect of Rumbek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchio, Diocese of Vicenza, Italy
Ordained PriestVerona, Diocese of Verona, Italy

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Rumbek.

  • a priest for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Mar 2021
  • sole/opl: AM, 22 Mar 2021
  • ob: AM, 25 Mar 2021
  • c2+: AM, 15 Apr 2021
  • ~ob: CB, 1 May 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 May 2021

Quantcast