Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix-Henri-François-Donatien Perroy, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}

Titular Bishop of Medea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 May 1866BornTalmont, France
3 Mar 188922.8Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
11 May 192053.9AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar
11 May 192053.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Medea
18 Jan 192154.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Medea
18 Oct 192559.4SucceededVicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar
10 Apr 193164.9DiedVicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}, Myanmar

MicroData Summary for Félix-Henri-François-Donatien Perroy:
Bishop Félix-Henri-François-Donatien Perroy M.E.P. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Southern Burma {Birmania Meridionale}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013