Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pjetėr Bogdani

Deceased

Archbishop of Skopje


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1630¹BornGur i Hasit
6 Mar 165626.2AppointedBishop of Shkodrė (Scutari), Albania
8 Nov 167747.9AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
Nov 168959.8DiedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pjetėr Bogdani:
Archbishop Pjetėr Bogdani Archbishop of Skopje

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 346
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 307

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013