Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mihael Summa

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje, Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1695Born
28 Oct 171823.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Nov 172833.6AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
3 Jul 172934.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
23 Sep 174348.5ResignedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
20 Nov 177782.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Skopje, Macedonia

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mihael Summa (VIAF: 35263066)
Archbishop Mihael Summa (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalba, Diocese of Sapë, Albania
Ordained BishopCrkva sv. Spasitelja, Velja

  • a priest for 59.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 347
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 54
  • b/c2+: CB, 9 Aug 2016
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,043

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast