Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marko Bandulavić (Bandonus), O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Moldova

Titular Bishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1595¹Born
16 Nov 164348.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Moldova
16 Nov 164348.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Marcianopolis
21 Aug 164449.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Marcianopolis
27 Jan 165055.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Moldova

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marko Bandulavić (Bandonus) (VIAF: 305646684)
Bishop Marko Bandulavić (Bandonus) O.F.M. Obs. (born 1595, died ) Apostolic Administrator of Moldova

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSkopje, Archdiocese of Dardania, North Macedonia
Ordained BishopKreševo, Diocese of Vrhbosna, Bosnia and Herzegovina
Death PlaceBacau, Apostolic Administration of Moldova

  • a bishop for 5.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,114
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,644, Number 9
  • c2: AT, 15 Dec 2019
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Number 20,262

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast