Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Giorgio Topich, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

Titular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1790¹Born
12 Jan 184252.0AppointedBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
12 Jan 184252.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Skopje, North Macedonia
20 Feb 184252.1Ordained BishopBishop of LezhŽ {Lesh, Alessio}, Albania
1845¹55.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Skopje, North Macedonia
27 Sep 185363.7AppointedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
17 Jan 185969.0ResignedBishop of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania
10 Jul 185969.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
11 Jun 186878.4DiedBishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ (Scutari), Albania

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Giorgio Topich (VIAF: 255008781)
Archbishop Giovanni Giorgio Topich O.F.M. Obs. (born 1790, died ) Bishop Emeritus of ShkodrŽ (Scutari)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSplit
Ordained BishopTor de’ Specchi, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 26.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,845
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 453, and Page 505
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 67, and Page 337
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1,842, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast