Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lazėr Mjeda (Miedia)

Deceased

Archbishop of Shkodrė, Albania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1869Born
10 Nov 190031.6AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
20 Jan 190131.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sapė, Albania
10 Jan 190535.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Shkodrė, Albania
10 Jan 190535.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Areopolis
14 Apr 190940.1AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
19 Oct 192152.6AppointedArchbishop of Shkodrė, Albania
8 Jul 193566.3DiedArchbishop of Shkodrė, Albania

MicroData Summary for Lazėr Mjeda (Miedia) (VIAF: 89629289)
Archbishop Lazėr Mjeda (Miedia) (born , died ) Archbishop of Shkodrė

EventPlace
Birth PlaceShkodrė, Archdiocese of Shkodrė

  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,314
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 501
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Number 17,489
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,901, Number 2
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 65, and Page 334

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast