Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Matthaeus Crasnich

Deceased

Archbishop of Skopje, Macedonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1763Born
8 Mar 181653.1AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
22 Sep 181653.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
25 Oct 182764.7DiedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia

MicroData Summary for Matthaeus Crasnich
Archbishop Matthaeus Crasnich (born , died ) Archbishop of Skopje

EventPlace
Birth PlacePrizren

  • a bishop for 11.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 46
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast