Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Smiljan Franjo Cekada

Deceased

Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1902Born
5 Apr 192522.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 193936.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
6 Jun 193936.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
6 Aug 193936.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pharbaethus
18 Aug 194037.7AppointedBishop of Skopje, North Macedonia
12 Jun 196764.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
12 Jun 196764.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Thibuzabetum
13 Jan 197067.1SucceededArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina
18 Jan 197673.1DiedArchbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}, Bosnia and Herzegovina

MicroData Summary for Smiljan Franjo Cekada
Archbishop Smiljan Franjo Cekada (born , died ) Archbishop of Vrhbosna {Sarajevo}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonji Vakuf

  • a priest for 50.7 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 35
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 382, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 720, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast