Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Nicolaus Bianchi

Deceased

Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Aug 1830AppointedArchbishop of Skopje, Macedonia
18 Feb 1832ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Skopje, Macedonia
26 Jun 1838AppointedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
30 Nov 1838Ordained BishopArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania
7 May 1843DiedArchbishop of Durrės (Durazzo), Albania

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Nicolaus Bianchi:
Archbishop Nicolaus Bianchi (died ) Archbishop of Durrės (Durazzo)

  • a bishop for 4.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 182, and Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013