Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Kalist

Bishop of Meerut


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Nov 1957 BornRitapuram
30 Dec 198225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Meerut, India
3 Dec 200851.0AppointedBishop of Meerut, India
8 Feb 200951.2Ordained BishopBishop of Meerut, India

MicroData Summary for Francis Kalist:
Bishop Francis Kalist (born ) Bishop of Meerut

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Meerut.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,052

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013