Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Xavier Corbet (Corbey), C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar

Titular Bishop of Obba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1836Born
2 Jun 186024.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Aug 186024.6ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Jan 188044.0AppointedPrefect of Pondicherry, India
1 Sep 188650.6ResignedPrefect of Pondicherry, India
5 Jul 189862.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Madagascar {Madagascar Settentrionale}, Madagascar
5 Jul 189862.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Obba
2 Oct 189862.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obba
26 Jul 191478.5DiedVicar Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez, Madagascar

MicroData Summary for François-Xavier Corbet (Corbey) (VIAF: 46753651)
Bishop François-Xavier Corbet (Corbey) C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Diégo-Suarez

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHochfelden, Diocese of Strasbourg, France
Ordained Bishoprue Lhomond, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a priest for 54.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 422
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017