Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Donald Joseph Thériault

Bishop Emeritus of Canada, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1946 BornPaquetville
8 May 197125.3Ordained PriestPriest of London, Ontario, Canada
25 Mar 199852.1AppointedBishop of Canada, Military
1 Jun 199852.3Ordained BishopBishop of Canada, Military
8 Apr 201670.2ResignedBishop of Canada, Military

MicroData Summary for Donald Joseph Thériault
Bishop Donald Joseph Thériault (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Canada, Military

Please contact the Bishop through the Military Ordinariate of Canada, Military.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Number 13,332
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Apr 2016
  • mn: CB, 8 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 May 2016