Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Anthony Daniels

Bishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1957 BornWindsor
7 May 198325.9Ordained PriestPriest of London, Ontario, Canada
21 Sep 200447.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of London, Ontario, Canada
21 Sep 200447.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
9 Nov 200447.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scebatiana
1 Mar 201153.7AppointedBishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada
11 Apr 201153.8InstalledBishop of Grand Falls, Newfoundland, Canada

MicroData Summary for Robert Anthony Daniels:
Bishop Robert Anthony Daniels (born ) Bishop of Grand Falls

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grand Falls.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,711
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013