Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mario de Gasperín Gasperín

Bishop Emeritus of Querétaro, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1935 Born
30 Oct 196025.7Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jun 198348.3AppointedBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
4 Aug 198348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Tuxpan, Veracruz, México
4 Apr 198954.2AppointedBishop of Querétaro, México
20 Apr 201176.2RetiredBishop of Querétaro, México

MicroData Summary for Mario de Gasperín Gasperín
Bishop Mario de Gasperín Gasperín (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Querétaro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Querétaro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 21 Jul 2018

Quantcast