Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Trinidad Zapata Ortiz

Bishop of Papantla, Puebla, México

Apostolic Administrator of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1959 Born
9 May 199030.9Ordained PriestPriest of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
12 Jun 200445.0AppointedBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
31 Jul 200445.1Ordained BishopBishop of San Andrés Tuxtla, Veracruz, México
20 Mar 201454.8AppointedBishop of Papantla, Puebla, México
13 Aug 202162.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Jalapa (Xalapa), Veracruz, México

MicroData Summary for José Trinidad Zapata Ortiz
Bishop José Trinidad Zapata Ortiz (born ) Bishop of Papantla

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZacatecas
Ordained BishopCentro de Pastoral Juan Pablo II, Catemaco

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Papantla.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,664
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2014
  • aadm: CB, 17 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 18 Aug 2021

Quantcast