Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alphonse Daignault, S.J. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Zambese, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1850Born
1881²30.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1887²36.9AppointedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
1891²40.9ResignedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
29 Dec 193888.9DiedSuperior Emeritus of Zambese, Zimbabwe

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alphonse Daignault
Father Alphonse Daignault S.J. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Zambese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLongueil, Canada

  • a priest for 57.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 25 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast