Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Alfred Weld, S.J. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Zambese, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Aug 1823Born
1854²30.4Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1883²59.4AppointedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
1887²63.4ResignedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
24 Jul 189066.9DiedSuperior Emeritus of Zambese, Zimbabwe

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfred Weld (VIAF: 92958836)
Father Alfred Weld S.J. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Zambese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLeagram Whalley, Lancashire, Great Britain

  • a priest for 36.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 25 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast