Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henry Schomberg Kerr, S.J. †

Deceased

Superior of Zambese, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Aug 1838Born
Sep 1875³37.0Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
1891²52.3AppointedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
18 Aug 189557.0DiedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henry Schomberg Kerr (VIAF: 106928731)
Father Henry Schomberg Kerr S.J. (born , died ) Superior of Zambese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDittisham, Devonshire, Great Britain

  • a priest for 19.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 25 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast