Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Henri Joseph Depelchin, S.J. †

Deceased

Superior Emeritus of Zambese


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jan 1822BornRussignies, Belgium
1844²21.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
14 Sep 185432.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Jul 187957.4AppointedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
Apr 1883³61.1ResignedSuperior of Zambese, Zimbabwe
26 May 190078.3DiedSuperior Emeritus of Zambese, Zimbabwe

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri Joseph Depelchin
Father Henri Joseph Depelchin S.J. (born , died ) Superior Emeritus of Zambese

  • a priest for 45.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 23 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 24 Feb 2016