Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri Léonard, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tabora

Titular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Dec 1869BornOeutrange, France
2 Jul 189525.6Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
26 Jun 191242.6AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Unianyembé, Tanzania
26 Jun 191242.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
27 Jun 191242.6SucceededVicar Apostolic of Unianyembé, Tanzania
10 Aug 191242.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tipasa in Mauretania
23 Jul 192858.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tabora, Tanzania
15 May 195383.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tabora, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Henri Léonard:
Bishop Henri Léonard M. Afr. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tabora

  • a priest for 57.9 years
  • a bishop for 40.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 113, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013