Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislav Zela

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Harpasa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1893BornHorní Netcice
5 Jul 191724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
11 Oct 194047.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
11 Oct 194047.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Harpasa
14 Sep 194148.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Harpasa
6 Dec 196976.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Stanislav Zela:
Bishop Stanislav Zela (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013