Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karel Skoupy

Deceased

Bishop of Brno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1886BornLipuvka
16 Jul 191124.5Ordained PriestPriest
3 Apr 194659.3AppointedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
30 Jun 194659.5Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
22 Feb 197285.1DiedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Karel Skoupy:
Bishop Karel Skoupy (born , died ) Bishop of Brno

  • a priest for 60.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,903
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1946, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013