Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leopold Prečan

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1866Born
5 Jul 188923.3Ordained PriestPriest
10 Nov 192357.6AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
30 Dec 192357.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
2 Mar 194780.9DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Leopold Prečan (VIAF: 83870705)
Archbishop Leopold Prečan (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTynec

  • a priest for 57.6 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1948
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • c34: MW
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1923, Number 72
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast