Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Josef Schinzel

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Elusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Mar 1869BornKronsdorf
1892²22.8Ordained PriestPriest
14 Nov 192253.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
14 Nov 192253.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Elusa
7 Jan 192353.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Elusa
28 Jul 194475.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Josef Schinzel:
Bishop Josef Schinzel (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 52.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,441
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015