Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giorgio Cattaneo

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1663BornCavalesino
30 Mar 168623.0Ordained PriestPriest
2 Mar 171248.9AppointedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
3 Apr 171249.0Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
7 Nov 173067.6DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giorgio Cattaneo:
Bishop Giorgio Cattaneo (born , died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 415
  • ob/c2: CB, 12 May 2013
  • c34: CB, 27 May 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 28 May 2015