Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Faustino Giuseppe Griffoni Sant’Angelo

Deceased

Bishop of Crema


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1669BornCrema
1 May 169728.1Ordained PriestPriest
25 Sep 170233.5AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
1 Oct 170233.5Ordained BishopBishop of Crema, Italy
2 May 173061.1DiedBishop of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Faustino Giuseppe Griffoni Sant’Angelo:
Bishop Faustino Giuseppe Griffoni Sant’Angelo (born , died ) Bishop of Crema

  • a priest for 33.0 years
  • a bishop for 27.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 175
  • ob/c23: CB, 25 May 2013
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,686
  • b/c23: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1702, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 30 Jun 2015