Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gaspar Fuster, C.O. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Sassari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1652³BornAlbocácer, Spain
22 Sep 167422.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
8 Jun 167522.9Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
27 Aug 171462.1SelectedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
1 Oct 171462.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
25 Nov 171462.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Sassari, Italy
28 Aug 172068.1DiedArchbishop of Sassari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaspar Fuster:
Archbishop Gaspar Fuster C.O. (born , died ) Archbishop of Sassari

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 5.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 31, Number 89
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 396

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 7 Jul 2015