Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardino Guinigi

Deceased

Archbishop of Lucca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1663³BornCamaiore
23 Nov 171046.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
27 Nov 171047.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Jun 171147.5AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
7 Jun 171147.5Ordained BishopBishop of Rieti, Italy
20 Dec 172360.0AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
11 Sep 172662.7AppointedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
13 Jan 172965.1DiedArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Guinigi:
Archbishop Bernardino Guinigi (born , died ) Archbishop of Lucca

  • a priest for 18.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 247, and Page 330
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015