Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Marazzani

Deceased

Bishop of Parma, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1680Born
11 May 171130.4AppointedBishop of Parma, Italy
7 Jun 171130.4Ordained BishopBishop of Parma, Italy
12 Aug 176079.6DiedBishop of Parma, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Marazzani
Bishop Camillo Marazzani (born , died ) Bishop of Parma

EventPlace
Birth PlacePiacenza

  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1753
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 308
  • c34: CB, 14 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1711, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast