Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Poniński

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

Titular Bishop of Aradus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1675BornGunigla
20 Sep 169822.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
17 Sep 169923.7Ordained PriestPriest
19 Dec 172550.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland
19 Dec 172550.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aradus
24 Feb 172650.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aradus
Sep 1727³51.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles Poniński:
Bishop Charles Poniński (born , died Sep 1727) Auxiliary Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 27.9 years
  • a bishop for 1.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 94
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015