Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodor Kazimierz Czartoryski

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Jul 1702³BornStolzenberg
15 Dec 172624.4Ordained DeaconDeacon
25 Mar 172724.7Ordained PriestPriest
29 Oct 173836.3SelectedBishop of Poznań, Poland
26 Jan 173936.5ConfirmedBishop of Poznań, Poland
8 Mar 173936.6Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
1 Mar 176865.6DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodor Kazimierz Czartoryski:
Bishop Teodor Kazimierz Czartoryski (born Jul 1702, died ) Bishop of Poznań

  • a priest for 40.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 346
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1739, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015