Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pablo Padilla y Bárcena

Deceased

Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1848Born
23 Dec 187123.9Ordained PriestPriest
17 Dec 189143.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Salta, Argentina
17 Dec 189143.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
3 Apr 189244.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pentacomia
19 Jan 189344.9AppointedBishop of Salta, Argentina
16 Feb 189345.0InstalledBishop of Salta, Argentina
8 Feb 189850.0AppointedBishop of Tucumán, Argentina
22 Jan 192172.9DiedBishop of Tucumán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Pablo Padilla y Bárcena (VIAF: 89266597)
Bishop Pablo Padilla y Bárcena (born , died ) Bishop of Tucumán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJujuy, Diocese of Salta
Ordained BishopBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Death PlaceJujuy, Diocese of Salta

  • a priest for 49.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 446, and Page 494
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 570
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017