Catholic-Hierarchy DC

František Saleskı Cardinal Bauer

Deceased

Archbishop of Olomouc

Cardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1841BornHrachovec
28 Feb 186322.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Olomouc, Czech Republic
19 Jul 186322.5Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
30 Apr 188241.3SelectedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
3 Jul 188241.4ConfirmedBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
15 Aug 188241.6Ordained BishopBishop of Brno, Czech Republic
10 May 190463.3AppointedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
27 Nov 191170.8Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 191170.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Girolamo dei Croati
25 Nov 191574.8DiedArchbishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for František Saleskı Bauer:
Cardinal František Saleskı Bauer (born , died ) Archbishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.3 years
  • a cardinal for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 160
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013