Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilhelm Blazek

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

Titular Bishop of Modra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1837BornOlomouc
11 Sep 185922.3Ordained PriestPriest of Olomouc, Czech Republic
6 Dec 190669.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic
6 Dec 190669.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Modra
6 Jan 190769.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Modra
7 Mar 191274.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Olomouc, Czech Republic

MicroData Summary for Wilhelm Blazek:
Bishop Wilhelm Blazek (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1912
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1907, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015