Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camille Jean-Baptiste Vandekerckhove, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Sep 1906Born
6 Sep 193124.9Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Jun 194639.7AppointedPrefect of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Dec 195751.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
24 Dec 195751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Sufetula
20 Apr 195851.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sufetula
10 Nov 195953.1AppointedBishop of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)
27 Feb 197568.4DiedBishop of Bikoro, Congo (Dem. Rep.)

MicroData Summary for Camille Jean-Baptiste Vandekerckhove
Bishop Camille Jean-Baptiste Vandekerckhove C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Bikoro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIngelmunster, Belgium

  • a priest for 43.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast