Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Kuching

Archidioecesis Kuchingensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Ha Tiong Hock, Archbishop
  • Peter Chung Hoan Ting, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 31 May 1976
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Malaysia
  • Square Kilometers: 19,173 (7,405 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 940, 118 Jalan Tun Abnag Haji Openg, 93000 Kuching, Sarawak, Malaysia
  • Telephone: (082)242-634
  • Fax: 425-724

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Sarawak
5 February 1927ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Labuan e Borneo Prefecture Apostolic of Sarawak (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuching
14 February 1952ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Sarawak Vicariate Apostolic of Kuching
19 December 1959Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Kuching Vicariate Apostolic of Miri (erected)
Archdiocese of Kuching
31 May 1976ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Kuching Archdiocese of Kuching
22 December 1986Territory LostArchdiocese of Kuching Diocese of Sibu (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Prefecture Apostolic of Sarawak
195012,230546,0002.2%128294215411ap1951
Vicariate Apostolic of Kuching
196952,700754,5987.0%4033737215210316ap1971
Archdiocese of Kuching
198091,960966,0009.5%1024342,7043283ap1981
199082,620735,00011.2%125174,8609639ap1991
1999118,300760,00015.6%171186,5723659ap2000
2000123,740850,00014.6%172196,5124689ap2001
2001129,300937,60013.8%163196,8055659ap2002
2002133,1291,000,00013.3%153187,3965649ap2003
2003138,510939,55014.7%165216,59576710ap2004
2004140,307939,55014.9%186245,846106310ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 19 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014