Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Vogel, M.E.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Shantou [Swatow]


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1878BornBischwir, France
23 Jun 190122.6Ordained PriestPriest of La Société des Missions Etrangères
10 Dec 193456.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Swatow [Shantou], China
10 Dec 193456.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Parlais
1 May 193556.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Parlais
9 Dec 193557.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Swatow [Shantou], China
11 Apr 194667.4AppointedBishop of Shantou [Swatow], China
13 Apr 195879.4DiedBishop of Shantou [Swatow], China

MicroData Summary for Charles Vogel:
Bishop Charles Vogel M.E.P. (born , died ) Bishop of Shantou [Swatow]

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1935, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013