Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Julio Colombo, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Prelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Camachus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1870Born
19 May 189424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
18 Dec 192454.8AppointedPrelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil
18 Dec 192454.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
3 May 192555.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Camachus
8 Nov 192757.7DiedPrelate of São José do Grajaú, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Roberto Julio Colombo
Bishop Roberto Julio Colombo O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Prelate of São José do Grajaú

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCastellanza, Italy

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast