Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paulo Hipólito de Souza Libório

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1913Born
8 Apr 193925.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Mar 194935.4AppointedBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil
5 Jun 194935.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caruaru, Pernambuco, Brazil
20 Jun 195945.6AppointedBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
23 Apr 198066.5ResignedBishop of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil
31 Mar 198167.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Parnaíba, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Paulo Hipólito de Souza Libório
Bishop Paulo Hipólito de Souza Libório (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Parnaíba

EventPlace
Birth PlacePicos

  • a priest for 41.9 years
  • a bishop for 31.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast