Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Urbanč

Bishop of Catamarca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1958 BornBuenos Aires
30 May 198223.8Ordained PriestPriest of Tucumán, Argentina
14 Nov 200648.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Catamarca, Argentina
10 Mar 200748.6Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Catamarca, Argentina
27 Dec 200749.4SucceededBishop of Catamarca, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis Urbanč:
Bishop Luis Urbanč (born ) Bishop of Catamarca

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Catamarca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 14 Nov 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 188, Number 15,344
  • s: Bollettino, 27 Dec 2007

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013