Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Van Hoeck, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ranchi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1870BornAntwerpen, Belgium
1903²32.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
20 Jul 192050.3AppointedBishop of Patna, India
6 Mar 192150.9Ordained BishopBishop of Patna, India
15 Feb 192857.8AppointedBishop of Ranchi, India
30 Jun 192858.2InstalledBishop of Ranchi, India
30 Apr 193363.0DiedBishop of Ranchi, India

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis Van Hoeck:
Bishop Louis Van Hoeck S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Ranchi

  • a priest for 30.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1934
  • op/ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013