Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Krishnagar

Dioecesis Krishnagarensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Suren Gomes, S.D.B., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 1887
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Calcutta
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 8,640 (3,337 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Krishnanagar-741101, Nadia Dt., West Bengal, India
  • Telephone: (03472)52.554
  • Fax: 57.931

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Central Bengal
1870ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Western Bengal Prefecture Apostolic of Central Bengal (erected)
Diocese of Central Bengal
1 September 1886ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Central Bengal Diocese of Central Bengal
Diocese of Krishnagar
1887Name ChangedDiocese of Central Bengal Diocese of Krishnagar
13 December 1889Territory LostDiocese of Krishnagar Prefecture Apostolic of Assam (erected)
25 May 1927Territory LostDiocese of Krishnagar Diocese of Dinajpur (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Krishnagar
19507,7637,957,675.1%202038828456ap1951
197014,8854,397,012.3%2626572412269ap1971
198021,8504,872,000.4%331346424822711ap1981
199035,5946,788,000.5%827351,01614227512ap1991
199956,0007,400,000.8%1427411,36514232213ap2000
200056,1907,358,890.8%1228401,4044333513ap2001
200159,3457,358,890.8%2126471,26214330313ap2002
200259,9757,360,680.8%2520451,33215131014ap2003
200360,0457,431,480.8%2520451,33414132414ap2004
200460,15810,561,058.6%2228501,20314232814ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 12 Jun 2013