Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Giuseppe Lasagna, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Titular Bishop of OŽa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1850BornMontemagno, Italy
1867¹16.8ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
8 Jun 187323.3Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Mar 189343.0AppointedTitular Bishop of OŽa
12 Mar 189343.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of OŽa
6 Nov 189545.7DiedTitular Bishop of OŽa

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Giuseppe Lasagna:
Bishop Luigi Giuseppe Lasagna S.D.B. (born , died ) Titular Bishop of OŽa

  • a priest for 22.4 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013