Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Émile Élie Verhille, C.S.Sp. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Fort-Rousset, Congo

Titular Bishop of Gibba


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1903Born
8 Jul 192825.4Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
31 Mar 192926.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Holy Spirit
21 Jun 195148.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Fort-Rousset, Congo
21 Jun 195148.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cernitza
21 Dec 195148.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cernitza
14 Sep 195552.6AppointedBishop of Fort-Rousset, Congo
2 Mar 196865.1ResignedBishop of Fort-Rousset, Congo
2 Mar 196865.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Gibba
2 Dec 197774.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Fort-Rousset, Congo

MicroData Summary for Émile Élie Verhille
Bishop Émile Élie Verhille C.S.Sp. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Fort-Rousset

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrchies, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained DeaconSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained PriestSeminary of the Missions, Chapel, Chevilly-Larue, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSaint-Jean-Baptiste, Church, Tourcoing, Diocese of Lille, France
Death PlaceChevilly-Larue, Diocese of Créteil, France

  • a priest for 48.6 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 120
  • od/c01/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 12 Jul 2018

Quantcast