Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Murphy Drona, S.D.B.

Bishop Emeritus of San Pablo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Oct 1941 BornPangil
22 Dec 196726.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
10 Jun 198745.6AppointedBishop of San Jose, Philippines
25 Jul 198745.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Jose, Philippines
14 May 200462.5AppointedBishop of San Pablo, Philippines
25 Jan 201371.2ResignedBishop of San Pablo, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Leo Murphy Drona:
Bishop Leo Murphy Drona S.D.B. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of San Pablo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Pablo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,510
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jan 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 21 Jul 2015