Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Georges de Souillac

Deceased

Bishop of Lodève


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Aug 1685BornAzerat
2 Jun 173246.7SelectedBishop of Lodève, France
1 Oct 173247.1ConfirmedBishop of Lodève, France
18 Jan 173347.4Ordained BishopBishop of Lodève, France
14 Feb 175064.4DiedBishop of Lodève, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Georges de Souillac:
Bishop Jean-Georges de Souillac (born , died ) Bishop of Lodève

  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1733, Number 1
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 264

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015