Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustus Marie Martin

Deceased

Bishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1803Born
31 May 182825.3Ordained PriestPriest
29 Jul 185350.4AppointedBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA
30 Nov 185350.8Ordained BishopBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA
29 Sep 187572.6DiedBishop of Natchitoches, Louisiana, USA

MicroData Summary for Augustus Marie Martin (VIAF: 314791115)
Bishop Augustus Marie Martin (born , died ) Bishop of Natchitoches

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Malo, Diocese of Saint-Malo, France
Ordained BishopSt. Louis, Cathedral, New Orleans, Archdiocese of New Orleans, Louisiana

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 403
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 52

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast